FL H1279 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for nonapplication of retroactive assessment & collection of ad valorem taxes on property under specified circumstances; provides criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assessment of Property for Back Ad Valorem Taxes [EPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0020 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0912 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-66
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-26 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01092
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -SJ 00812; Passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 -SJ 00812
2010-04-23 In Messages; Received -SJ 00802; Referred to Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00802; Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00781; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 2450 -SJ 00781; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00941; Read 3rd time -HJ 00941; Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 -HJ 00941
2010-04-17 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00762
2010-04-16 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00762
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-04-11 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00663
2010-04-09 Favorable by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00663
2010-04-07 On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 04/09/10, 11:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-25 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00407; Now in Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00407
2010-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/25/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-03 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00205
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00115
2010-02-24 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2450 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781; Substituted HB 1279 -SJ 00781; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1279 (Ch. 2010-66) -SJ 00781

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0193092Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback