FL S2296 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the Florida Water Pollution Control Financing Corporation as the Florida Water Pollution Control and Drinking Water Financing Corporation. Expands the jurisdiction of the corporation to include loans made from the drinking water state revolving loan fund. Revises the purposes for the Drinking Water Revolving Loan Trust Fund. Provides that the trust fund is exempt from the termination provisions of the State Constitution, etc.
Title
Drinking Water [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Carey Baker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205) | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00197 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00197 | |
2010-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0550 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-205; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225)
H7207 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
H7207 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0011 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 1835 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 1837 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 8532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 8533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |