FL H7207 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Florida Water Pollution Control Financing Corporation as Florida Water Pollution Control & Drinking Water Financing Corporation; revises provisions regarding purpose, powers, & duties of corporation; provides that specified drinking water projects & activities are eligible for financing; authorizes DEP to request loans for planning, designing, & constructing specified public water systems, etc.
Title
Drinking Water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205) | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00791 | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by- Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 00791 | |
2010-04-18 | On Council agenda-- Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development, 04/19/10, 10:15 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00662 | |
2010-03-31 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00441 |
Same As/Similar To
S0550 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-205; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225)
S2296 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
S2296 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0011 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 1835 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 1837 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 8532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 8533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |