FL S2284 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Fixes the date for convening the regular session of the Legislature in the year 2012.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislature [GPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0950 - Passage (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0014 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-17 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-91
2010-05-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-26 Ordered enrolled -SJ 01137
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01053; Passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 -HJ 01053
2010-04-23 Substituted for HB 7227 -HJ 00938; Read 2nd time -HJ 00938
2010-04-22 Received -HJ 00919; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00919
2010-04-21 In Messages
2010-04-16 Read 3rd time -SJ 00626; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00626
2010-04-15 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00594
2010-04-06 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00511; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2010-03-17 Favorable by Reapportionment; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 00270; Now in Rules -SJ 00270
2010-03-12 On Committee agenda-- Reapportionment, 03/17/10, 10:15 am, 110-S
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00197
2010-03-04 Referred to Reapportionment; Rules -SJ 00197
2010-02-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H7227 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 2284; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2284 (Ch. 2010-91) -HJ 00938

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback