FL H7227 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 2284; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2284 (Ch. 2010-91) -HJ 00938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 2284; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2284 (Ch. 2010-91) -HJ 00938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fixes date for convening regular session of Legislature in 2012.
Title
Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 2284; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2284 (Ch. 2010-91) -HJ 00938 | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by- Rules and Calendar Council; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 00763; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00763 | |
2010-04-16 | Referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00732; On Council agenda-- Rules and Calendar Council, 04/19/10, 6:15 pm or 15 minutes upon adjournment of Session, 404-H | |
2010-04-15 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00715 |
Same As/Similar To
S2284 (Similar To) 2010-05-17 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-91