FL S2232 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00669; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 159 -SJ 00669; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 159 (Ch. 2010-49) -SJ 00669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00669; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 159 -SJ 00669; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 159 (Ch. 2010-49) -SJ 00669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expands an exemption from the applicability of certain provisions of state law to include workers' compensation claims under employer liability coverage. Provides that certain provisions of state law do not prohibit the furnishing of certain information in a form prepared by the Florida Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association upon the request of a policyholder or applicant for insurance, etc.
Title
Guaranty Associations [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00669; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 159 -SJ 00669; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 159 (Ch. 2010-49) -SJ 00669 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00600 | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-13 | CS/CS by- General Government Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00600; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00611 | |
2010-04-12 | Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00552; On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 401-S | |
2010-04-09 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00565 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00151 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; General Government Appropriations | |
2010-02-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0159 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-49
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0631 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 717 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 7295 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 735 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |