FL H0159 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-49
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-49
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts workers' compensation claims under employer liability coverage from application of specified requirements; authorizes insurers to recoup specified assessments levied by OIR; expands application of state law to specified residents of other states who own insurance policies; expands list of contracts & policies to which life & health insurance guaranty of payments provisions do not apply, etc.
Title
Guaranty Associations [CPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Ambler [R] | Sen. John Legg [R] | Rep. Peter Nehr [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0005 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House Roll Call No. 0817 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House Roll Call No. 0817 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-49 | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700 | |
2010-04-23 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032 | |
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00723; CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 -SJ 00723 | |
2010-04-21 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00668; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 2232 -SJ 00669; Read 2nd time -SJ 00668 | |
2010-04-20 | In Messages; Received -SJ 00656; Referred to Banking and Insurance; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00656 | |
2010-04-20 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00771; CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00771 | |
2010-04-19 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00747 | |
2010-04-15 | CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -HJ 00717; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00720 | |
2010-04-14 | CS/CS/CS by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00722 | |
2010-04-12 | CS read 1st time on 04/12/10 -HJ 00657; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00661; On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 04/14/10, 9:15 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-04-09 | CS/CS by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00663 | |
2010-04-07 | On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 04/09/10, 11:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-04-06 | Now in Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00608 | |
2010-03-31 | CS read 1st time on 03/31/10 -HJ 00442; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-25 | CS by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00449 | |
2010-03-23 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/25/10, 2:45 pm, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Finance & Tax Council; General Government Policy Council -HJ 00021 | |
2009-10-23 | Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Finance & Tax Council; General Government Policy Council | |
2009-09-30 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2232 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00669; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 159 -SJ 00669; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 159 (Ch. 2010-49) -SJ 00669
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0631 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 717 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 7295 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 735 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |