FL S2170 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00935; Substituted HB 7085 -SJ 00935; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116), CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130) -SJ 00935
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00935; Substituted HB 7085 -SJ 00935; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116), CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130) -SJ 00935
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a specified provision which provides an exemption from public records requirements for complaints and related records held by the Commission on Ethics or a Commission on Ethics and Public Trust established by a county or municipality and an exemption from public meetings requirements for proceedings conducted by such commissions pursuant to a complaint or preliminary investigation, etc.
Title
OGSR/Commission on Ethics/Ethics and Public Trust [GPSC]
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00935; Substituted HB 7085 -SJ 00935; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116), CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130) -SJ 00935 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-15 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00598; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-03-30 | Now in Rules -SJ 00333 | |
2010-03-24 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-23 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00333; CS read 1st time on 03/24/10 -SJ 00334 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/23/10, 3:15 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-10 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/09/10, 9:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 00147 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | |
2010-02-18 | SPB 7072 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2170) by Ethics and Elections; Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0551 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-130; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
S1054 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00919; Amendment(s) adopted (638382) -SJ 00919; Substituted CS/HB 551 -SJ 00919; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116) -SJ 00919
H1423 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
S2494 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
H7085 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-116; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130)
S1054 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00919; Amendment(s) adopted (638382) -SJ 00919; Substituted CS/HB 551 -SJ 00919; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116) -SJ 00919
H1423 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
S2494 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
H7085 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-116; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130)