FL H0551 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-130; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-130; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
Summary
Revises exemption from public record & public meeting requirements for complaints & related records in custody of & proceedings conducted by county or municipality with established local investigatory process to enforce more stringent standards of conduct & disclosure requirements; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions under Open Government Sunset Review Act; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec. & Meetings/County/Complaints on Conduct [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Chapter No. 2010-130; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116) | |
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01284 | |
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01050; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 01050 | |
2010-04-27 | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00919; Substituted for CS/SB 1054 -SJ 00919; Read 2nd time -SJ 00919 | |
2010-04-23 | Received -SJ 00802; Referred to Community Affairs; Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00802 | |
2010-04-20 | In Messages | |
2010-04-20 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00773; CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 -HJ 00773 | |
2010-04-19 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00749 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00647; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00647 | |
2010-04-05 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-12 | Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00279 | |
2010-03-11 | CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -HJ 00263; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-10 | CS by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00268 | |
2010-03-08 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/10/10, 8:00 am, 306-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00051 | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-12-29 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1054 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00919; Amendment(s) adopted (638382) -SJ 00919; Substituted CS/HB 551 -SJ 00919; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116) -SJ 00919
S2170 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00935; Substituted HB 7085 -SJ 00935; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116), CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130) -SJ 00935
H1423 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
S2494 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
H7085 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-116; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130)
S2170 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00935; Substituted HB 7085 -SJ 00935; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116), CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130) -SJ 00935
H1423 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
S2494 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130), HB 7085 (Ch. 2010-116)
H7085 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-116; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 551 (Ch. 2010-130)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0551&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |