FL S2050 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses the legislative intent to revise laws relating to insurance.
Title
SSB/Insurance [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; General Government Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00139 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; General Government Appropriations; Rules | |
2010-02-16 | Filed |