FL S1990 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that the Agency for Persons with Disabilities review a waiver support coordinator's performance to ensure that the support coordinator meets or exceeds criteria established by the agency; authorizing the agency to consult with the Department of Health, the Agency for Health Care Administration, the Department of Business and Professional Regulation, and the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services concerning procedures related to the storage, preparation, serving, or display of food and procedures related to the detection and prevention of diseases caused by certain factors in the environment, etc.
Title
Developmental Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#911 (Y: 88 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Budget Conference Committee on Budget/Appropriations: Alexander (Chair), Negron (Vice Chair), Bennett (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Gardiner (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Rich (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Budget Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bogdanoff (Chair), Evers, Smith, Storms; Budget Conference Committee on Education Pre-K - 12/PreK-12: Simmons (Chair), Detert, Gardiner, Montford, Ring; Budget Conference Committee on Finance and Tax: Norman (Chair), Alexander, Gaetz, Siplin; Budget Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Braynon, Bullard, Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Jones, Thrasher; Budget Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Negron (Chair), Fasano, Flores, Garcia, Oelrich, Rich, Richter, Sobel; Budget Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Lynn (Chair), Altman, Sachs, Siplin, Wise; Budget Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Hudson (Chair), Baxley, Bileca, Corcoran, Cruz, Davis, Diaz, Pafford, Schwartz, Wood, Young -HJ 899 | |
2012-02-27 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-27 | Refused to concur, acceded to request for conference committee -HJ 846 | |
2012-02-27 | Received -HJ 838 | |
2012-02-23 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | Immediately certified -SJ 630 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 2nd time -SJ 630 | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced -SJ 528 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/12 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 528 | |
2012-02-16 | SPB 7096 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1990) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
393 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 0661 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 0662 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |