FL S1970 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission to adopt rules prohibiting law enforcement officers, correctional officers, or correctional probation officers from using specified techniques; providing an exception; requiring the commission to provide specified data regarding final commission orders to the National Decertification Index; requiring the commission to establish and maintain standards for the instruction of officers in specified subjects in order to build upon and improve police-community relations; revising the minimum aspects of law enforcement that the law enforcement accreditation program must address, etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/24/21, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-18 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/16/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1513 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
H7051 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-241
H7051 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-241
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 1715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 1716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |