FL S1888 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the use of an electronic device to provide proof of insurance; increasing financial responsibility limits with respect to bodily injury or death; requiring insurers to submit information to the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles and to notify insureds about bodily injury insurance rather than personal injury protection coverage; providing for the termination of personal injury protection policies and the requirement for maintaining minimum security requirements that allow a person to respond to property damage and bodily injury by a certain date, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Filed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | SPB 7152 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1888) by Banking and Insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S1886 (Related) 2013-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H0635 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
H7125 (Similar To) 2013-06-13 - Chapter No. 2013-160
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1458 (Similar To) 2013-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160)
H0635 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
H7125 (Similar To) 2013-06-13 - Chapter No. 2013-160
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1458 (Similar To) 2013-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 0221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 989 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 06501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0652 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0653 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6482 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 727 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 728 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 733 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 734 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 737 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 739 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 8405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1888 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1888/BillText/Filed/HTML |