FL S1878 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a credit against the corporate income tax, the sales and use tax, or a stated combination of the two taxes to a qualifying business that establishes a qualifying project for the creation of intellectual property which meets a certain capital investment threshold; specifying the calculation of the credit; authorizing use of the credit or portions of the credit by the business or members of its affiliated group of corporations; authorizing use of the credit within a certain timeframe, etc.
Title
Capital Investment Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |