FL S1832 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Pending: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, subject to appropriation, to implement a pilot program to provide incentives to Florida growers to contribute high-quality fresh fruits and vegetables to food recovery entities in the state; authorizing food recovery entities to negotiate the purchase price of produce and reimburse agricultural companies for certain costs; requiring the department to reimburse food recovery entities for certain costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Recovery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2022-01-26SenateFavorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2022-01-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2022-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1379 (Same As) 2022-01-14 - Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
H1567 (Similar To) 2022-01-16 - Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
595420Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback