FL H1379 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Pending: House Environment, Agriculture and Flooding Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs DACS, subject to appropriation, to implement pilot program to provide incentives to Florida growers to contribute high-quality fresh fruits & vegetables to food recovery entities in state; authorizes food recovery entities to negotiate purchase price of produce & reimburse agricultural companies for certain costs; requires department to reimburse food recovery entities for certain costs; requires department to submit report to Governor & Legislature by specified date & to adopt rules; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Recovery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseNow in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1832 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
H1567 (Similar To) 2022-01-16 - Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
595420Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback