FL H1567 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DACS, subject to appropriation, to implement pilot program to provide funds to food recovery entities to expand capabilities for extending shelf life of fresh produce; provides qualification criteria; requires department to submit report to Governor & Legislature by specified date & to adopt rules; provides appropriation.
Title
Food Recovery
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1379 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
S1832 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1832 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1567 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1567/BillText/Filed/PDF |