FL S1830 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8039 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8039 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 6, 2017, as "FAMU Day" in Florida, etc.
Title
FAMU Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8039 (Adopted) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8039 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1830 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1830 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1830/BillText/Filed/HTML |