FL S1816 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the date by which the Legislature intends for bonds issued to fund the Florida Forever Act to be retired; requiring a specified annual appropriation to the Florida Forever Trust Fund; deleting an obsolete provision; prohibiting the use of certain moneys distributed from the Land Acquisition Trust Fund for specified costs, etc.
Title
Land Acquisition Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1377 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
201 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |