FL S1810 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses the legislative intent to revise laws relating to pre-K through 12 education.
Title
SSB/Pre-K through 12 Education [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00123 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Rules | |
2010-02-09 | Filed |