FL S1786 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the order in which the tax credit for businesses employing and providing certain support to employees who serve as family caregivers is applied against the corporate income tax or the franchise tax; providing a tax credit for certain qualified businesses employing and providing mental health support to employees who serve as family caregivers, etc.
Title
Family Caregiver Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 197 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1786 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1786/BillText/Filed/HTML |