FL S1770 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration to pay for donor human milk bank services as an optional Medicaid service if certain conditions are met; adding donor human milk bank services to the list of Medicaid services authorized for reimbursement on a fee-for-service basis; adding donor human milk bank services to the list of minimum benefits required to be covered by Medicaid managed care plans, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Donor Human Milk Bank Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2022-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1333 (Same As) 2022-01-14 - Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409973Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback