FL S1764 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expressing the legislative intent to revise laws relating to higher education, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SSB/Higher Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations
2012-01-18 Now in Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations
2012-01-18 Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 255
2012-01-17 Introduced -SJ 232
2012-01-17 Referred to Budget -SJ 232
2012-01-06 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback