FL S1742 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the term "transit oriented development." Provides for the expedited review of comprehensive plan amendments that implement transportation concurrency exception areas. Provides for the sharing of costs of mitigation for transportation concurrency. Provides for certain landowners or developers to request a transportation concurrency backlog area for a development area, etc.
Title
Growth Management [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-21 | Withdrawn from Transportation -SJ 00701; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 37-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-19 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/24/10, 1:15 pm, 37-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-15 | Now in Transportation -SJ 00191 | |
2010-03-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-04 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 00191; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00246 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Transportation; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00120; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Community Affairs; Transportation; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0163 | 3164 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0163 | 3182 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0380 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |