FL S1726 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Congress of the United States to support the expiration and removal of moratoria prohibiting exploration and production of domestic supplies of oil and natural gas in federal waters surrounding Florida and to include Florida in revenue sharing resulting from the production of oil and natural gas in federal waters surrounding Florida.
Title
Expiration/Removal of Moratoria/Oil/Natural Gas [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00119 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0563 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Rules and Calendar Council