FL S1724 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Prescription Drug Affordability Commission within the Agency for Health Care Administration; requiring manufacturers to notify the commission of proposed price increases and introductory prices of prescription drugs under certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to individual health insurance coverage for preexisting conditions; prohibiting specified insurers from establishing, in their franchise health insurance policies, differentials in premium rates based on preexisting conditions, etc.
Title
Health Care Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1293 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
H1295 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
H1295 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 02033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 9091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 429 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 642 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6426 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6561 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 65612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 65613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 65614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 65625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6571 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6578 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6692 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 66997 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6741 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 1855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31077 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1724 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1724/BillText/Filed/HTML |