FL H1293 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Prescription Drug Affordability Commission to review prescription drug costs & inform public; provides for determination of prescription drug rates; prohibits insurers & HMOs from declining to offer coverage under individual, group, blanket, franchise health insurance, & small employer policies to certain groups, employers, & individuals; prohibits such insurers from imposing preexisting condition exclusions & from establishing differentials in premium rates based on preexisting conditions; provides factors on which premium rates under individual, franchise, & small employer policies must be based.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Regulations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1295 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
S1724 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38102033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4089091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409816Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627429Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627642Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276426Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62764875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276561Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62765612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62765613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62765614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62765625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276571Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276578Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276692Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276699Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62766997Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6411855Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413922Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback