FL S1716 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a local government from applying transportation concurrency or requiring proportionate-share contribution or construction for new business development for a specified period; providing for an extension of the prohibition under certain conditions; providing for future expiration; prohibiting certain counties, municipalities, and special districts from imposing certain new or existing impact fees for a specified period; providing for an extension of the prohibition under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Growth Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Now in Education |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Education |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Transportation |
2013-04-04 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/13, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Transportation; Education |
2013-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0321 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 31801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |