FL H0321 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits local government from applying transportation concurrency or requiring proportionate-share contribution or construction for new business development for specified period; provides exception; provides for extension of prohibition under certain conditions; provides for applicability; provides for future expiration; prohibits certain counties, municipalities, & special districts from imposing certain new or existing impact fees for specified period; provides exception; provides for extension of prohibition under certain conditions; provides for applicability; provides for future expiration.
Title
Community Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#271 (Y: 103 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Education |
2013-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 103 NAYS 13 |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13 |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | CS/CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-18 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-16 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2013-04-05 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-04-04 | House | CS/CS by Finance and Tax Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-03 | House | CS/CS by Finance and Tax Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 |
2013-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Subcommittee, 04/03/13, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2013-03-21 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2013-03-20 | House | CS by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-19 | House | CS by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2013-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1716 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 31801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |