FL S1710 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to authorize the use of military force against al-Qaeda, the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant (ISIL), and all other global Islamic terrorist organizations that similarly engage in acts of terrorism, etc.
Title
Use of Military Force Against Global Islamic Terrorist Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Messages |
2016-03-10 | House | In Messages |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CS adopted |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/29/16, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-23 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/22/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1319 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar