FL S1700 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring district water management plans for districts including Outstanding Florida Springs to include certain maximum sustainable groundwater estimates; requiring the water management district, instead of the Department of Environmental Protection, to conduct reviews of certain regional water supply plans upon the denial of an application for a water use permit due to impact on minimum flow or water level; requiring a district or the department, if an Outstanding Florida Spring is below minimum flow or water level, to reserve certain water quantities from permit applicants, etc.
Title
Water Management
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 0421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1700 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1700/BillText/Filed/HTML |