FL S1672 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1261 (Ch. 2021-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1261 (Ch. 2021-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the State University Free Seat Program; providing an exemption from tuition and fees, including lab fees, for one online course at a state university for certain resident students; prohibiting a state university from charging such students more than a specified percentage of the tuition rate and the tuition differential under certain circumstances; providing a limitation on the application of such tuition discount, etc.
Title
State University Free Seat Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1261 (Ch. 2021-232) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 845 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/21 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/13/21, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H845 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-217; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
H1261 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-232
H1261 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-232