FL S1668 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a limitation on actual expenses of certain lodging that may be reimbursed for a state agency or judicial branch employee; prohibiting the use of state funds to purchase alcoholic beverages and to purchase food or beverages for certain state agency appreciation or recognition events, etc.
Title
Use of State Funds
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Sen. Frank Artiles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/18/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2017-04-04 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1137 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H479 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
S880 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)
H479 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
S880 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 0161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
286 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |