FL S1624 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to authorize the Legislature to provide, by general law, ad valorem tax relief on homestead property to the parent or parents of an unmarried veteran who died from service-connected causes while on active duty as a member of the United States Armed Forces, etc.
Title
Homestead Tax Exemption/Parents of Unmarried Veteran Who Died from Service-connected Causes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1622 (Related) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax
H1391 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
H1393 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
H1391 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
H1393 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1624 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1624/BillText/Filed/HTML |