FL S1622 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from taxation the homestead property of the parent or parents of an unmarried veteran who died from service-connected causes while on active duty as a member of the United States Armed Forces, etc.
Title
Homestead Property Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2016-02-02 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1624 (Related) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax
H1393 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
H1391 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
H1393 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
H1391 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee