FL S1624 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Federal Law Enforcement Trust Fund within the Department of Legal Affairs. Provides sources of funds. Exempts the trust fund from a service charge. Provides for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund.
Title
Federal Law Enforcement Trust Fund/DLA [WPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0007 - Trust Fund Bills (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-03-18 | In Messages | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00265; Read 3rd time -SJ 00265; CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 00265; Immediately certified -SJ 00265 | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00183 | |
2010-03-03 | CS by- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00183; CS read 1st time on 03/03/10 -SJ 00186; Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00113; On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 03/03/10, 9:15 am, 37-S | |
2010-02-26 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 03/03/10, 9:15 am, 37-S | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2010-02-03 | Filed |