FL S1614 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Education to suspend specified payments to private schools that fail, rather than knowingly fail, to meet certain scholarship program accountability standards; providing that the failure of, rather than the inability of, private schools to meet such standards constitutes the basis for ineligibility for participation in a scholarship program, etc.
Title
Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Education |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1756 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1614 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1614/BillText/Filed/HTML |