FL S1612 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to Section 4 of Article VI of the State Constitution, relating to disqualifications from voting and holding public office, to automatically restore the voting rights and right to hold public office of felons under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Restoration of Felons' Civil Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1339 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1612 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1612/BillText/Filed/HTML |