FL S1596 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the rights of residents of nursing home facilities; providing additional disqualifying offenses for purposes of background screening of employees of certain health care providers; creating a cause of action for ex parte injunctive relief against continued unlicensed activity relating to health care provider facilities; authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration to petition the court for such injunctive relief; providing for ex parte temporary injunctive relief under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Provider Accountability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307) |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1471 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-29 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1471 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Chapter No. 2023-307
S412 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307)
S412 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 812 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 328 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |