FL S0412 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring physicians performing gluteal fat grafting procedures in an office surgery setting to adhere to specified standards of practice; authorizing the Board of Medicine and the Board of Osteopathic Medicine, respectively, to adopt certain rules, etc.
Title
Gluteal Fat Grafting Procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1471 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Chapter No. 2023-307
S1596 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307)
S1596 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1471 (Ch. 2023-307)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
458 | 328 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/412 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/412/BillText/Filed/HTML |