FL S1590 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Education, upon request by a school district, to provide statewide, standardized assessments in any language to be administered to students with limited English proficiency; authorizing such students to choose to be administered the statewide, standardized assessments in their native language or in English; requiring the Department of Education, upon request by a school district, to develop and provide EOC assessments in any language to be administered to students with limited English proficiency, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native Language Assessments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1213 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12081Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback