FL H1213 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Commissioner of Education to provide statewide, standardized assessments in any language to be administered to students with limited English proficiency; authorizes statewide, standardized assessments in native language or in English; authorizes end-of-course (EOC) assessments in native language or in English; requires DOE to develop & provide EOC assessments in any language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native Language Assessments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1590 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12081Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback