FL S1584 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the reclassification of offenses committed while in possession of a weapon or firearm capable of holding more than 10 rounds of ammunition or while in possession of a firearm and more than one magazine for such firearm, etc.
Title
Reclassification of Offenses Involving Certain Firearms or Additional Firearm Magazines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H941 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1584 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1584/BillText/Filed/HTML |