FL S1576 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a provision relating to corporate income taxes imposed, automatic refunds, and downward adjustments of such tax rates, etc.
Title
Corporate Income Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6021 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 1105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1576 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1576/BillText/Filed/HTML |