FL H6021 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to corporate income taxes imposed, automatic refunds, & downward adjustments to tax rates.
Title
Corporate Income Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-09-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1576 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 1105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6021 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6021/BillText/Filed/PDF |