FL S1542 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing regulation requirements for premium for single interest insurance placed by financial institutions, etc.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1035 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1542 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1542/BillText/Filed/HTML |