FL S1516 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that instructional staff of public schools are encouraged to include the history of local African-American cemeteries in the study of the history of African Americans when practicable, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required Instruction in the History of African Americans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2022-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H447 (Same As) 2022-01-13 - Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback