FL H0447 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides instructional staff of public schools are encouraged to include history of local African-American cemeteries in study of history of African Americans.
Title
Required Instruction in the History of African Americans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2022-01-27 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-13 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-11-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1516 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education