FL S1516 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing additional legislative findings relating to the provision of services for individuals who have developmental disabilities; clarifying provisions relating to eligibility requirements based on citizenship and state residency; requiring the Agency for Persons with Disabilities to promote partnerships and collaborative efforts to enhance the availability of nonwaiver services; revising provisions relating to eligibility under the Medicaid waiver redesign; providing that final tier eligibility be determined at the time a waiver slot and funding are available; providing criteria for calculating an individual's iBudget; requiring that facilities that are accredited by certain organizations be inspected and reviewed by the agency every 2 years; authorizing the agency to contract for food services and inspection services to enforce standards, etc.
Title
Agency for Persons with Disabilities
Sponsors
Senate Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Rene Garcia [R] | Senate Health Regulation Committee |
Sen. Joe Negron [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Messages | |
2012-03-08 | In Messages | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1038 | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1037 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/12 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 805 | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 805 | |
2012-03-02 | CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 780 | |
2012-03-02 | Now in Budget -SJ 776 | |
2012-02-28 | CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 776 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-22 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2012-02-22 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 674 | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-13 | CS/CS by Health Regulation read 1st time -SJ 507 | |
2012-02-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-09 | CS/CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/09/12, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/31/12, 15 minutes after adjournment, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-30 | Now in Health Regulation | |
2012-01-27 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time -SJ 291 | |
2012-01-26 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-25 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/25/12, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 216 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 216 | |
2012-01-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
393 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 0661 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 0662 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |