FL S1514 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing additional personal property exemptions from legal process for medical debts resulting from services provided in certain licensed facilities; requiring a licensed facility to provide a cost estimate to a patient within a specified timeframe after recommending a specific course of treatment or set of services; prohibiting licensed facilities, under certain circumstances, from engaging in extraordinary collection actions against individuals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Billing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H999 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback